This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/24/2023 at 11:00:51 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Thomas Moturi

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Thomas Moturi. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9084

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

Defendant

Moturi, Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janet B. Turay

Defendant Attorney

Michael W Weston

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2024
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • DocketEmailed: CONTINUANCE TO PARTIES' ATTYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • DocketMotion For Continuance Filed: Agreed Motion for Continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketEmailed: HEARING NOTICE & ZOOM INFO TO PARTIES' ATTYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO JAVITCHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Moturi, Thomas: Served: 05/27/2023; Returned: 05/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2023-04973: Lvnv Funding Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less