This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/02/2023 at 08:38:56 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Thomas Moturi

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Thomas Moturi. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9084

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

Defendant

Moturi, Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janet B. Turay

Defendant Attorney

Michael W Weston

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/11/2024

DocketNon-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2024

DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketEmailed: RESET HEARING NOTICE & ZOOM INFO TO PARTIES' ATTYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketExhibit(s) Filed By Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Continuance Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketComments: NOT CONSIDERED, CONTINUANCE PREV REQUESTED AND GRANTED FOR UPCOMING COURT HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketProposed Order: Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketMotion For Continuance Filed: Motion For Continuance

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketEmailed: CONTINUANCE TO PARTIES' ATTYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
05/30/2023

DocketAnswer Due On

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketCitation Issued:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO JAVITCHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Moturi, Thomas: Served: 05/27/2023; Returned: 05/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2023-04973: Lvnv Funding Llc: (33.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lvnv Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less