This case was last updated from Tarrant County Court on 09/25/2023 at 15:03:55 (UTC).

TBF Financial, LLC vs Akkasmi Cable Services, LLC and Isamel Anderson

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 TBF Financial, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Akkasmi Cable Services, LLC and Isamel Anderson. This case was filed in Tarrant County Court, County Court at Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********59-2

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TBF Financial, LLC

Defendants

Akkasmi Cable Services, LLC

Anderson, Isamel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica N. Alt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Secretary of State Index # 9: Certificate of Secretary of State - Returned Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 8: Paper Returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 7: (Akkasmi Cable Services LLC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-194891: TBF Financial, LLC: (8.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketCitation: eServed to Attorney; Anderson, Isamel: Served: 07/26/2023; Returned: 08/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketRequest: Re: Email Original Amended Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 6: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106 Index # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • DocketCitation: emailed to attorney 7/14/23; Akkasmi Cable Services, LLC: Served: 07/21/2023; Returned: 07/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketMotion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Index # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketRequest: Issuance of Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's First Amended Petition Index # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-193343: TBF Financial, LLC: (229.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff TBF Financial, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 390.00; Total Payments and Credits: 390.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 366.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCitation: E-mail 2 cits to Attorney 6/2/2023; Akkasmi Cable Services, LLC: Unserved ; Anderson, Isamel: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketRequest: Issuance of Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: See notes please JMR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less