This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/23/2023 at 21:03:46 (UTC).

Capital One N.a. vs. Anita Mcdowell

Case Summary

On 08/16/2023 Capital One N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Anita Mcdowell. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2593

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One N.a.

Defendant

Mcdowell, Anita

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linhuyen Thi Pham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2023

DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $2,552.85; Awarded To: Capital One N.a.; Awarded Against: Anita Mcdowell

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted: MAILED TO PLTF ATNY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): 144.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketProposed Order: Order for Default Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketCITATION: Mcdowell, Anita: Served: 09/09/2023; Returned: 09/11/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketCitation Issued:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP8-2023-07704: Capital One N.a.: (37.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Capital One N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 58.00; Total Payments and Credits: 58.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 58.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less