This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/23/2023 at 14:07:54 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Erica Anaya

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Erica Anaya. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1490

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Anaya, Erica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/05/2023

DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketLetter Issued: - TO DFND - COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE/TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): ABC LEGAL / $86.50 /TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketAnswer Due On: TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCitation Returned: IN PERSON ON 9/20/23 @ 1136 AM BY ABC LEGAL/TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-04621: Discover Bank: (33.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCITATION: Anaya, Erica: Served: 09/20/2023; Returned: 09/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO PPS FOR SERVICE/TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketEFile Original Petition Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): RAUSCH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less