Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/20/2021 at 19:28:17 (UTC).

Carmen Burnett and Corey Yarbrough vs Maria Lopez

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Carmen Burnett and Corey Yarbrough filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Maria Lopez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********73-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Burnett, Carmen

Yarbrough, Corey

Defendants

or wherever Defendant may be found

Euless, TX 76039

Lopez, Maria

Euless, TX 76039

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Alan Howard

Defendant Attorney

STEPHEN T POSTLEWATE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice Index # 7: OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVITS CONCERNING COST AND NECESSITY OF SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-172231: Lopez, Maria: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Lopez, Maria; Total Financial Assessment: 40.00; Total Payments and Credits: 40.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5: (Dup Answer, but with Jury Fee Payment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3: (Maria Lopez)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171038: Burnett, Carmen: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Burnett, Carmen; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCitation: Picked up 4/12/2021; Lopez, Maria: Served: 04/13/2021; Returned: 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Howard