This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/15/2017 at 22:48:19 (UTC).

CARLOS A DIOSDADO vs. KACIE DRAYDEN AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 05/27/2014 CARLOS A DIOSDADO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KACIE DRAYDEN AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2533

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIOSDADO, CARLOS A

Defendant

DRAYDEN, KACIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $1,000.00; Awarded To: CARLOS DIOSDADO; Awarded Against: KACIE DRAYDEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketBond for Appeal Set: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : AT $2000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketDuring the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : $500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketDefault Notice Mailed: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketEvict - Default Judgment for Possession, Past Due Rent, & CC: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : $1000 PAST DUE RENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketHearing: (9:30 AM) () : Result: Judgment: 06/11/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • DocketComments: CONTACTED PLAINTIFF TO INFORM HIM COURT DATE CHANGED FROM (06/11/14) TO (06/13/14 AT 9:30AM) AS CONSTABLE DID NOT TIMELY SERVE CITATION TO DEFENDANT. CLERK ALSO INFORMED PLAINTIFF HE'LL BE RECEIVING A RESET NOTICE ON SAME.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • DocketEVICTION: 060914 2ND ALIAS CITN RETD/EXECUTED 060314/BY ALTERNATE SERVICE/ATTACHED/MAILED/SET FOR TRAIL (061314 @ 9:30AM); DRAYDEN, KACIE: Served: 06/03/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • DocketAlias Citation Requested: 2ND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketEVICTION: DRAYDEN, KACIE: Returned Unserved 06/02/2014; Returned: 06/02/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketMotion for Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketEVICTION: CITN RETD/REQUEST FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE; DRAYDEN, KACIE: Returned Unserved 05/29/2014; Returned: 05/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2014-00791: DIOSDADO, CARLOS A: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff DIOSDADO, CARLOS A; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less