This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/13/2023 at 19:01:57 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs. TIFFANY C MEDRANO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TIFFANY C MEDRANO. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9051

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant

MEDRANO, TIFFANY C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Ford

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Hearing; (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher) ; Judgment of $2,376.87; Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.; Awarded Against: TIFFANY MEDRANO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF AND MAILED TO DEFN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketSent to Judge For Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketProposed Order: fdj

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: mdj

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 2/18/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: e-mld to PCP at efiling@pcpusa.net

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-570: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Petition with Attachment(s) efiling@pcpusa.net

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less