This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/10/2023 at 21:00:19 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs. ETHAN A FITZGERALD

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ETHAN A FITZGERALD. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8256

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant

FITZGERALD, ETHAN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Charbonnet, Jason M)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2023-01425: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCITATION: FITZGERALD, ETHAN A: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED EFILING@PCPUSA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less