This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/31/2023 at 15:00:33 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs. CHRISTOPHER S WEBER

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER S WEBER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9052

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant

WEBER, CHRISTOPHER S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Ford

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Hearing; (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketCourt Notes: DUPLICATE NON SUIT | NO ACTION TAKEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketEmailed: COPY OF NON-SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: srv'd on 02.11.23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: e-mld to PCP at efiling@pcpusa.net

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-572: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Petition with Attachment(s) / efiling@pcpusa.net

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less