This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/01/2023 at 11:36:13 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs. ANGELA J ONEIL

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANGELA J ONEIL. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9308

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant

ONEIL, ANGELA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Defendant Attorney

Emery C. Shannon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) ; Agreed Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher) ; Judgment of $2,692.78; Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.; Awarded Against: ANGELA ONEIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketEmailed: JGNT to both attys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketProposed Order: AFJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) ; Continuance Granted; 06/28/2023; Reset by Court to 04/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketEMAILED/MAILED ORDER: w/RESET LTTR to both attys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: from 05.19.23 / 60 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed: w/req for continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Vacation Filed: defn's atty JUNE 21st - 28th

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 3.17.2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-1159: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s) efiling@pcpusa.net

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less