This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/07/2020 at 08:18:06 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. WALTER J. WELLE, III

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WALTER J WELLE, III. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0159

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

WELLE, III, WALTER J.

Arlington, TX 76013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen Ibrahim Amin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • Dispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $1,742.58; Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: WALTER WELLE, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Agreed Judgment Entered: FOR PLTF $1742.58 PLUS CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Agreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • CITATION: WELLE, III, WALTER J.: Served: 12/13/2019; Returned: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Citation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06136: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.