This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/09/2020 at 22:18:05 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. SEAN E KENNY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEAN E KENNY. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0118

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

KENNY, SEAN E

Arlington, TX 76011-3349

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (2:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketEmailed: CANCELLATION LETTER TO PLTF ATTY, MAILED DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO ALL PARTIES ADV OF CANCELLATION OF CURRENT COURT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketEmailed: HEARING NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEmailed: ALTERNATE SERVICE TO PCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMotion Filed: Motion for Alternative Service and Affidavit for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCITATION: KENNY, SEAN E: Served: 02/25/2020; Returned: 03/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06127: MOSS LAW FIRM PC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less