This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/19/2020 at 23:59:12 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. SABRINA R. GUERRA

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SABRINA R GUERRA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0161

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

GUERRA, SABRINA R.

Arlington, TX 76010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyla Nicole Baxter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - "Unable to Locate":

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $1,074.02; Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: SABRINA GUERRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Entered: FOR PLTF $1074.02 PLUS CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06136: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCITATION: GUERRA, SABRINA R.: Returned Unserved 01/15/2020; Returned: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less