This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/25/2021 at 08:24:19 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (usa) N.a. vs. Kristen J. Cox

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Capital One Bank usa N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kristen J Cox. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4762

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Cox, Kristen J.

Arlington, TX 76016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $1,958.38; Awarded To: Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.; Awarded Against: Kristen Cox; Comment: POST JUDGMENT INTEREST 0.00% PER ATTY REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: Order for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM; Cox, Kristen J.: Served: 10/04/2021; Returned: 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-04872: Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper