This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/07/2019 at 22:39:30 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. JOEL COBIAN

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOEL COBIAN. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9934

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

Defendant

COBIAN, JOEL

Arlington, TX 76017-0578

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Proposed Order: Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit (With Prejudice)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Motion Filed: Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit (With Prejudice)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Order to Retain Granted: 45 DAYS PER JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Proposed Order: Order Setting Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Proposed Order: Order Retaining

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Motion to Retain Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Letter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Affidavit Filed: Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Mailed: CITATION TO PCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • CITATION: PCP; COBIAN, JOEL: Served: 10/13/2018; Returned: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2018-07497: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less