This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/08/2022 at 22:10:11 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. JEREMY K TURNER

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEREMY K TURNER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5773

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

Defendant

TURNER, JEREMY K

Mansfield, TX 76063-7542

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Sanders, Kenneth D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: 1ST REQ // PLTF // 60 DAYS // EMAILED ORDER AND 7/11 RESET NOTICE TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed: OFFERING OF EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER GRANTING PS UNOPP MFC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketMotion For Continuance Filed: PS UNOPP MFC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/ 60 Day; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCopies Made as Previously Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCopies Requested: Request for Copy of Defendant's Answer // PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Non-Jury Trial: FOR 5/02/22 EMAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: AND WILL BE FILING AN ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: TELEPHONE NUMBER AND EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCITATION: TURNER, JEREMY K: Served: 02/19/2022; Returned: 02/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-00589: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)//efiling@pcpusa.net

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss