This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/17/2022 at 13:34:31 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. JASON P MURRELL

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON P MURRELL. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6178

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

Defendant

MURRELL, JASON P

Fort Worth, TX 76108-4601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketHearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEmailed: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL HEARING TO PLTF'S ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: served on 12/21/21 ALT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO EFILING@PCPUSA.NET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSent to Judge For Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed: Motion for Alternative Service, Affidavit for Substituted Service, and Order for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCITATION: MURRELL, JASON P: Served: 12/21/2021; Returned: 12/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO EFILING@PCPUSA.NET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-6475: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss