Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/30/2017 at 10:30:44 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. GIDEON M OKWENA

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GIDEON M OKWENA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4580

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

Defendant

OKWENA, GIDEON M

Colleyville, TX 76034-5768

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2017
  • Letter Issued: TO DEFN, COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE /JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Citation Returned: E-FILED; SERVED BY PPS ON 3/24/17 AT 108 PM IN PERSON /JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • CITATION: OKWENA, GIDEON M: Served: 03/24/2017; Returned: 03/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Comments: CITNS ISSUED AND MAILED TO PCP IN SASE FOR SERVICE. ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Comments: VIA MAIL BY PCP, REC'D COPY OF PETITION. COURT TO ISSUE CITNS. ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Comments: ADVISED TO PPS TO MAILED COPY OF PETITION OR PAY COPY FEE BEFORE CITNS WILL BE ISSUED. ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Military Affidavit Filed: ATTACHED TO ORIGINAL PETITION. ETN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • EFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2017-01002: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.: (41.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 41.00; Total Payments and Credits: 41.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss