This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/21/2020 at 07:07:15 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. CURTIS L. DYER

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CURTIS L DYER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0160

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

DYER, CURTIS L.

Arlington, TX 76006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sara June McKinney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06136: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCITATION: DYER, CURTIS L.: Served: 01/07/2020; Returned: 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less