This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/21/2022 at 10:09:13 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. CHRISTOPHER P AHLSCHIER

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER P AHLSCHIER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7418

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

Defendant

AHLSCHIER, CHRISTOPHER P

Hurst, TX 76053-6402

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DFNT, COURT INFORMED OF SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 12/18/21 @ 10:03AM BY PCP USA. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCITATION: AHLSCHIER, CHRISTOPHER P: Served: 12/18/2021; Returned: 12/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO PCP FOR SERVICE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-05776: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): MOSS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss