This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/27/2022 at 04:07:31 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (usa) N.a. vs. Barbara B. Goetz

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Capital One Bank usa N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Barbara B Goetz. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0793

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Goetz, Barbara B.

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: Order Notice of Non-Suit// EFILED// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit// EFILED// W/ O PREJ// BY PLTF ATTY// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCover Letter Filed: Cover Letter// EFILED// BY PLTF ATTY// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketEmailed: OPTN LTR TO PLTF ATTY//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: //JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return/EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CTN TO PPS// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCITATION: CTN ISSUED TO ABC// NO; Goetz, Barbara B.: Returned Unserved 01/25/2022; Returned: 01/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-00362: Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper