This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/20/2022 at 08:20:37 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. AMELIA L SMITH

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMELIA L SMITH. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5088

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

Defendant

SMITH, AMELIA L

Arlington, TX 76012-4627

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEmailed: RETAIN TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Retain Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProposed Order: ordr setting trl date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProposed Order: ordr to retain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketMotion to Retain Filed: mtn to retain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2021-06027: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO PCP; SMITH, AMELIA L: Served: 12/03/2021; Returned: 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss