This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/26/2019 at 04:34:57 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. ALAN M CAMBRON

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALAN M CAMBRON. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9154

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

Defendant

CAMBRON, ALAN M

Fort Worth, TX 76137-3753

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2018
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Judgment of $5,833.40; Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: ALAN CAMBRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Motion for Default Judgment Granted: COPY MLD TO ALL PARTIES//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed: EFILE/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Letter Sent to Pltf Due to Case Inactivity: TO PLTF//APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • CANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) ; For Tracking Purposes Only; 12/26/2018; Reset by Court to 11/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • Answer Due On: AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • Affidavit/Proof of Service Filed: EFILE AP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Emailed: CITN AND PETN TO PCP// LR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • CITATION: EMAILED PCP// LR; CAMBRON, ALAN M: Served: 10/05/2018; Returned: 10/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • EFile Original Petition Document: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION//EMAIL CTN TO: EFILING@PCPUSA.NET //DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Internet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2018-03165: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less