This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 08:26:58 (UTC).

Capital One Auto Finance vs Tarig M. Salih

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Capital One Auto Finance filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tarig M Salih. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********22-2

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Auto Finance

Defendants

Salih, Tarig M.

Bedford, TX 76021-7368

or wherever he may be found

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R Dwayne Danner

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 11: Alias Writ of Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketWrit of Sequestration: PCT 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-175588: Capital One Auto Finance: (156.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 156.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 10: Ltr request for issuance of Alias Writ of Sequestration and service via Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 9: Return of Non-Service - Defendant No Longer Resides at Residence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketWrit of Sequestration: PCT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-173622: Capital One Auto Finance: (157.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 157.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 8: re: Bond for Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketRequest: for Copy of Order for Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 5: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOrder for Sequestration Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Sequestration order signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-172946: Capital One Auto Finance: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Capital One Auto Finance; Total Financial Assessment: 569.00; Total Payments and Credits: 569.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketApplication Index # 3: Application for Issuance of Writ of Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANNER RICHARD DWAYNE