This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/12/2017 at 12:30:47 (UTC).

Canyonlake General Contracting, Inc. vs Wells Fargo (Texas), N. A.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2016 Canyonlake General Contracting, Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Wells Fargo Texas , N A. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********-2-A

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Canyonlake General Contracting, Inc.

Defendants

Wells Fargo (Texas), N. A.

Lubbock, TX 79408

b/s Lloyd Rinehart, Registered Agent

Lubbock, TX 79408

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clay D. Peebles

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2016
  • Dispositions: Order of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Order for Non-Suit Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Notice of Non-Suit Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Record - Other: postage slip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Citation by Certified Mail Doc ID#3: for writ of garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Writ of Garnishment: certified mail 70140510000147324575; Wells Fargo (Texas), N. A.: Served: 05/09/2016; Returned: 05/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Original Petition - Post Garnishment Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-100342: Canyonlake General Contracting, Inc.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCL-0363508: Peebles, Clay D.: (316.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 81.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 11.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Canyonlake General Contracting, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 318.00; Total Payments and Credits: 318.00; Balance Due as of 03/12/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 224.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer C.D. Peebles