Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/18/2018 at 07:59:26 (UTC).

CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST vs. LADONNA L COOK

Case Summary

On 08/14/2017 CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LADONNA L COOK. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8407

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST

Defendant

COOK, LADONNA L

Grand Prairie, TX 75052-7030

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jody D. Jenkins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2018
  • Dispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt) ; Judgment of $2,196.00; Awarded To: CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST; Awarded Against: LADONNA COOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Judgment Modified: BY COURT TO CORRECT NAMES ON SIGNED JUDGMENT, ONLY 1 DEFN NAMED IN CASE, BUT JUDGMENT PRESENTED IN COURT TO THE JUDGE SHOWED 2 NAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Comments: JUDGMENT FOR PLTF $2196.00 PLUS $1500.00 ATTY FEES, CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial: (1:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Comments: SET FOR TRIAL 120 DAYS PER JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Pre-Trial Hearing: (8:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) : Result: Set for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Answer Filed: @ WINDOW KSM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Order Entered on Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • CITATION: COOK, LADONNA L: Served: 09/20/2017; Returned: 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Alias Citation Requested: WITH NEW CASE NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Order Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Affidavit for Alternate Service Filed: CITATION RNTD WITH ALTERNATIVE SERVICE. SINCE CASE NUMBER CHANGED WILL ISSUE NEW CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • CITATION: COOK, LADONNA L: Returned Unserved 09/06/2017; Returned: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): ORIGINAL CASE WAS FILED AS DC6334. SHOULD HAVE BEEN SMALL CLAIMS. ORDER ENTERED SHOWING CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST; Total Financial Assessment: 41.00; Total Payments and Credits: 41.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jody D. Jenkins