Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/28/2017 at 02:03:15 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS. MARK D. TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 11/21/2012 CACH, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MARK D TAYLOR. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1488

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

TAYLOR, MARK D.

Bedford, TX 76021-5019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL J SCOTT

Michael J. Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2013
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.) ; Judgment of $4,653.82; Awarded To: CACH, LLC; Awarded Against: MARK D. TAYLOR; Comment: **18% POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST AS TO DAMAGES PORTION OF JUDGMENT AND 5% POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST AS TO ALL OTHER AMTS AWARDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Comments: FILE BEING INTER-OFFICED FROM SL TO HURST. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Comments: COURT TO TAKE NO ACTION ON APPOINTMENT FOR RECEIVERSHIP/NOT IN COURT'S JURISDICTION. LETTER TO PLTF ATTY STATING SAME. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Application for Appointment of Receiver Filed: BY PLTF ATTY. PRESENTING TO JUDGE. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • Default Notice Mailed: TO DEFN WITH SIGNED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ATTACHED./BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • Order Entered on Case: (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B. ) : AT TIME OF TRIAL, PLTF'S ATTY WAS PRESENT; DEFN DID NOT APPEAR. CT FINDS FINAL JUDGMENT (NEHIL) FOR PLTF FOR: $4653.82 DAMAGES; $500.00 ATTY'S FEES + CT COSTS @ 18% POSTJUDGMENT AS TO DAMAGES PORTION OF JUDGMENT AND 5% POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST AS TO ALL OTHER AMTS AWARDED. SIGNED COPY OF JUDGMENT GIVEN TO PLTF'S ATTY IN CT./BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • Non-Jury Trial: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Casey, Russell B.) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • Trial letter mailed: TO PLTF'S ATTY AND PRO SE DEFN GIVING NOTICE OF TRIAL BEING SET FOR 10/10/13 AT 11:00 A.M./BDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • Comments: PLTF ATTY APPEARED, DEFN APPEARED (PRO SE) AND MADE ORAL ANSWER IN COURT. PER JUDGE, SET FOR TRIAL. PLACED FILE IN TRIAL BIN. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • Prove Up Hearings: (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Casey, Russell B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2013
  • Citation Returned: DEFN SERVED BY RULE 536./BDM(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • Comments: COURIER WITH ABC LEGAL SERVICE WAS PICKED UP CITN PREPARED WITH RULE 536 ATTACHED./BDM(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • Order Approving Service by Rule 536 Entered: PER JUDGE'S SIGNATURE. CITN READY TO BE PICKED UP BY ABC LEGAL SERVICE WITH RULE 536 ORDER ATTACHED./BDM(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Motion for Service by Rule 536 Filed: WITH AFFIDAVIT OF PPS AND PROPOSED ORDER ALONG WITH CITN. BEING PRESENTED TO JUDGE./BDM(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • Comments: COURIER FROM ABC LEGAL SERVICE PICKED UP CITN./BDM(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • Comments: CITN ISSUED AND READY FOR PICK UP BY ABC LEGAL SERVICE./BDM(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • CITATION: TAYLOR, MARK D.: Served: 01/30/2013; Returned: 02/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): W/DISCOVERY ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP3-2012-04892: SCOTT, MICHAEL J: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 31.00; Total Payments and Credits: 31.00; Balance Due as of 02/27/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott, Michael J