Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/30/2021 at 19:35:04 (UTC).

Byrd Autos vs. GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY DBA GEICO

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Byrd Autos filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY DBA GEICO. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4469

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Byrd Autos

1244 Southridge Court Suite 102

Hurst, TX 76053

Defendant

GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY DBA GEICO

P.O. Box 509090

San Diego, CA 92150-9090

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David L. Pritchard

Defendant Attorney

Christopher T. Colby

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketEmailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCITATION: GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY DBA GEICO: Served: 04/01/2021; Returned: 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-02339: Byrd Autos: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Byrd Autos; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Byrd Autos is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher T. Colby