This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2017 at 17:13:40 (UTC).

BUTLER PLACE APARTMENTS vs. STAR MITCHELL AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 10/07/2015 BUTLER PLACE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STAR MITCHELL AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3508

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUTLER PLACE APARTMENTS

Defendant

MITCHELL, STAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $501.72; Awarded To: BUTLER PLACE APARTMENTS; Awarded Against: STAR MITCHELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketTranscript of Judgment on Appeal Prepared: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketPLTF Never Responded on Statement of Inability to Pay Appeal: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketDefn Paid Rent into Court Registry on Statement of Inability: WITH MONEY ORDER * KEJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketMailed Pltf Notice-Statement of Inability on Appeal Filed: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketNotice Given to Defn of Rent to be Paid on Eviction Appeal: DEFN'S MONTHLY RENT AMOUNT IS $537 * KEJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketEviction - Statement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Filed: BY DEFN * KEJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketEvict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: OF $501.72 + CC - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketHearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerWoodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketComments: RETURN EXECUTED ON 10/08/2015 TO B/M OVER 16/YOA , COURT DATE 10/22/2015@8:30..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketComments: RETURN EXECUTED TO B/M O 16/YOA, COURT DATE 10/22/2015@8:30...RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: MITCHELL, STAR: Served: 10/08/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): PRINTED AND ISSUED TO C08..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-03537: BUTLER PLACE APARTMENTS: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff BUTLER PLACE APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Butler Place Apartments is a litigant