This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/15/2017 at 00:39:28 (UTC).

BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO PLANET vs. PEPE'S ROOFING, INC.,JOSE C. GARCIA

Case Summary

On 02/22/2011 BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO PLANET filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEPE'S ROOFING, INC ,JOSE C GARCIA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5956

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

SERVE: JOSE E. GARCIA

Fort Worth, TX 76119

BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO PLANET

2514 Mansfield Hwy.

Fort Worth, TX 76119

PEPE'S ROOFING, INC.

2514 Mansfield Hwy.

Fort Worth, TX 76119

GARCIA, JOSE C.

Fort Worth, TX 76119

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2013
  • Order Transferring Case to Justice Court Entered: BLANKET ORDER ENTERED. ORDER NOT IN JACKET - WILL BE POSTED IN OFFICE AND KEPT WITH COURT MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • Comments: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • CITATION: PEPE'S ROOFING, INC.: Served: 03/04/2011; Returned: 03/07/2011; GARCIA, JOSE C.: Served: 03/04/2011; Returned: 03/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2011-00840: BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO: (111.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Transaction Assessment: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO PLANET; Total Financial Assessment: 111.00; Total Payments and Credits: 111.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Business Basics LLC is a litigant