This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/15/2017 at 00:39:26 (UTC).

BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO PLANET vs. NTX CONSTRUCTION,ANTHONY GARCIA

Case Summary

On 02/22/2011 BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO PLANET filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NTX CONSTRUCTION,ANTHONY GARCIA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Bierman-Davis, Linda. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5955

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Bierman-Davis, Linda

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO PLANET

1124 W, Fuller Avenue

Fort Worth, TX 76140

Defendants

NTX CONSTRUCTION

6340 Rendon New Hope Road

Fort Worth, TX 76140

SERVE: ANTHONY GARCIA

Fort Worth, TX 76140

GARCIA, ANTHONY

Fort Worth, TX 76140

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2011
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Bierman-Davis, Linda) ; Judgment of $4,360.25; Awarded To: BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO PLANET; Awarded Against: NTX CONSTRUCTION, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2013
  • Order Transferring Case to Justice Court Entered: BLANKET ORDER ENTERED. ORDER NOT IN JACKET - WILL BE POSTED IN OFFICE AND KEPT WITH COURT MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued and Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • Default Notice Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • Pre-Trial Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerBierman-Davis, Linda) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • Answer Due On: BOT ANSWERS DUE 4/4/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • Motion for Service by Rule 536 Filed and Approved: (2) MOTN FOR RULE 536 SIGNED & RETN'D TO CONST. BURGESS, PCT 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • Motion for Service by Rule 536 Filed: REC'D (2) REQUESTS FOR RULE 536

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • CITATION: NTX CONSTRUCTION: Served: 03/24/2011; Returned: 03/30/2011; GARCIA, ANTHONY: Served: 03/24/2011; Returned: 03/30/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2011-04825: BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • Transaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2011-00839: BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO: (111.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Transaction Assessment: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff BUSINESS BASICS LLC DBA PROMO PLANET; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Business Basics LLC is a litigant