This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/11/2022 at 16:08:16 (UTC).

Builder Services Group, Inc. vs Crain Square Building Company LLC

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Builder Services Group, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Crain Square Building Company LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********95-1

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Builder Services Group, Inc.

dba Truteam Builder Services Group, Ind dba Williams Insulation

Defendants

Crain Square Building Company LLC

58 Crain Square Blvd

Houston, TX 77025

B/S its Registered Agent, The Tobin Firm PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Eden

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 15: Electronically Served to Party's Attorney and/or Mailed to all Pro-Se Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Compel Index # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Zoom re SJ. Mr McShane for Plaintiff. Defendant not appear or respond. e sign order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel: (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 13: RE: Notice of Hearing / Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Index # 12: Attendance at Oral Deposition/Responses to Discovery/Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 11: Writ of Execution return on Crain Square Building Company LLC Nulla Bona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-180500: Builder Services Group, Inc.: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution: mail to attorney 3/16/22 Q.C. Completed 04/26/2022. VS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 7: Affidavit of Robert L. Eden

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address Index # 6: Certificate of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Index # 5: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Crain Square Building Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-178072: Builder Services Group, Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Builder Services Group, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 266.00; Total Payments and Credits: 266.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCitation: citation mld to atty.; Crain Square Building Company LLC: Served: 12/14/2021; Returned: 12/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: Request for Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crain Square Building Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where William Insulation Company, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Builder Services Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Eden