This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/15/2022 at 20:30:18 (UTC).

Builder Services Group, Inc. dba Trueteam Builder Services Group, Inc. dba LCR Contractors vs Skyline Commercial, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Builder Services Group, Inc dba Trueteam Builder Services Group, Inc dba LCR Contractors filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Skyline Commercial, Inc. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********33-3

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Builder Services Group, Inc.

dba Truteam Builder Services Group, Inc. dba LCR Contractors

Defendants

Skyline Commercial, Inc.

Po Box 12079

Austin, TX 78711-2079

B/S Registered Agent, Stephanie A. Haug

b/s Secretary of State

Service of Process

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Eden

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Secretary of State Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-174384: Builder Services Group, Inc.: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCitation: QC complete 08-11-21. VS; Skyline Commercial, Inc.: Served: 08/06/2021; Returned: 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 6: RE: Request Issuance of Secretary of State Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's First Amended Petition Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: (Skyline Commercial Inc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-173547: Builder Services Group, Inc. dba: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Builder Services Group, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 266.00; Total Payments and Credits: 266.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCitation: citation mld to attorney; Skyline Commercial, Inc.: Served: 07/14/2021; Returned: 07/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Service of Process is a litigant

Latest cases where dba Truteam Builder Services Group, Inc. dba Austin Contractor Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Builder Services Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Eden