Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/23/2021 at 08:10:42 (UTC).

Budget Suites of America vs Qeauna Denise Richardson, Adarris Richardson, And All Other Occupants

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Budget Suites of America filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Qeauna Denise Richardson, Adarris Richardson, And All Other Occupants. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********22-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Budget Suites of America

3500 Northeast Loop 820, Budget Suites Of America

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Defendants

Richardson, Qeauna Denise

Fort Worth, TX 76137

And All Other Occupants

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Richardson, Adarris

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy U. Stanford

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index #18: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment After non Jury Trial; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Final After Non Jury Index #17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Zom NJ trial. Mr Stanford and client rep Coffeen for Plaintiff. Qeauna Richardson appeared. Court will sign Judgment Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: sign paper Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (10:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder Setting Trial Index #16: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketLetter Requesting Setting for Trial Index #15: RE: Request for Setting of Bench Trial at the Court's Earliest Convenience

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Counsel Index #14: for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #13

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJP Transcript of Judgment Index #10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJP Motions & Orders Index #9: Order Denying CDC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJP Motions & Orders Index #8: Order Contesting CDC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder on Abate Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Centers for Disease Control Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Inability to Pay Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJP Notice of Appeal Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJP Judgment Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJP Sworn Complaint for Eviction Index #2:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOCA Appeal Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUDGET SUITES OF AMERICA is a litigant