This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/14/2017 at 06:51:17 (UTC).

BRUCE A HENRY vs. RONALD HOWARD AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 BRUCE A HENRY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RONALD HOWARD AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9160

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENRY, BRUCE A

Defendant

HOWARD, RONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed Before Trial (Other than DWOP, Plaintiff, Nons); (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketCANCELED: Hearing; (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) ; Case Disposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Court's Motion: CITATION UNEXECUTED KSM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketCalled Plaintiff on this Case: INFORMED PLTF OF VACANT PROPERTY & CASE WONT BE HEARD. HE SAID THANK YOU. KSM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Property Vacant:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: HOWARD, RONALD: Returned Unserved 08/11/2015; Returned: 08/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketCANCELED: Hearing; (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerHayes, Matt) ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketCalled Plaintiff on this Case: ADVISED HIM THE ADDR HE WROTE WAS INCORRECT. NEED AM PET, ADD'L SVC FEE & WE WILL ISSUE NEW CRT DT. HE IS OUT OF TOWN & REQ'D WE HOLD TIL 8/6 FOR AM PET, WHICH I OK'D. TH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: HOWARD, RONALD: Returned Unserved 07/28/2015; Returned: 07/28/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2015-04896: HENRY, BRUCE A: (75.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2015-04521: HENCY, BRUCE A: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff HENRY, BRUCE A; Total Financial Assessment: 191.00; Total Payments and Credits: 191.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less