This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/16/2017 at 06:33:50 (UTC).

BRIAN HARDWICK vs. TEMECA COOPER AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 BRIAN HARDWICK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TEMECA COOPER AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7032

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARDWICK, BRIAN

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant

COOPER, TEMECA

Fort Worth, TX 76105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2016
  • Dispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $1,227.17; Awarded To: BRIAN HARDWICK; Awarded Against: TEMECA COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Writ of Possession Returned: CANCELLED PER PLTF REQUEST BTW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION: COOPER, TEMECA: Returned Unserved 09/23/2016; Returned: 09/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Writ of Possession Requested: BY PLTF * KEJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is: $995.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Bond for Appeal Set: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Evict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: FOR $1227.17BR+CC..RDK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Hearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Comments: RET EXECUTED TO temeca cooper;COURT DATE 09/07/16 AT 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • EVICTION: COOPER, TEMECA: Served: 08/19/2016; Returned: 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-03317: PROPERTY FRAMEWORKS: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-02933: PROPERTY FRAMEWORKS: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff HARDWICK, BRIAN; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due as of 02/16/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less