This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/15/2017 at 06:26:59 (UTC).

BRIAN HARDWICK vs. TECOYA THOMPSON AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/10/2015 BRIAN HARDWICK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TECOYA THOMPSON AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4254

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIAN HARDWICK

Defendant

THOMPSON, TECOYA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $5,326.54; Awarded To: BRIAN HARDWICK; Awarded Against: TECOYA THOMPSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketComments: CANCELLED PER PLTF REQUEST BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: THOMPSON, TECOYA: Returned Unserved 02/09/2016; Returned: 02/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Requested: BY PLTF * KEJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketEvict - Default Judgment for Poss, & Past Due Rent: OF $5326.54 + CC - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketDefault Notice Mailed: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketHearing: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketComments: RET EXECUTED VIA RULE 510.4C;COURT DATE 12/21/15 AT 8:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: THOMPSON, TECOYA: Served: 12/15/2015; Returned: 12/15/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketRequest For Alternate Service Filed and Approved: btw

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: THOMPSON, TECOYA: Returned Unserved 12/14/2015; Returned: 12/14/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-00323: PROPERTY FRAMEWORKS: (155.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-04379: PROPERTY FRAMEWORK: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff BRIAN HARDWICK; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due as of 02/15/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less