This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/15/2017 at 07:41:16 (UTC).

BRENTWOOD APARTMENTS vs. SHANNON BROWN AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/23/2015 BRENTWOOD APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHANNON BROWN AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4430

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRENTWOOD APARTMENTS

Defendant

BROWN, SHANNON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $1,156.61; Awarded To: BRENTWOOD APARTMENTS; Awarded Against: SHANNON BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketComments: REAL PROPERTY RET'D TO RIGHTFUL OWNER BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketTranscript of Judgment on Appeal Prepared: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: BROWN, SHANNON: Served: 02/02/2016; Returned: 02/02/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Req After an Appeal Filed: btw

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketDefn Did Not Pay Rent to Court on Statement of Inability: btw

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketMailed Copy of Appeal to Plaintiff: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketNotice Given to Defn of Rent to be Paid on Eviction Appeal: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketEviction - Statement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Filed: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketEvict - Default Judgment for Poss, & Past Due Rent: OF $1156.61 + CC - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketDefault Notice Mailed: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketHearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketComments: CITATION RETURNED EXECUTED TO, S. BROWN-COURT DATE 01/11/2016@8:30AM..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: BROWN, SHANNON: Served: 12/28/2015; Returned: 12/29/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): CITATION PRINTED AND ISSUED TO C08..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-00315: KATHY TANKERSLY NATIONWIDE EVICTION: (155.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-04554: KATHY TANKERSLEY NATIOWIDE EVICTION: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff BRENTWOOD APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due as of 02/15/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRENTWOOD APARTMENTS is a litigant