Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 04:53:31 (UTC).

BG Personnel Services, L.P. vs Silber Montgomery, LLC d/b/a 7 Square Apartments and B&M Management Company, LLC d/b/a 7 Square Apartments

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 BG Personnel Services, L P filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Silber Montgomery, LLC d/b/a 7 Square Apartments and B M Management Company, LLC d/b/a 7 Square Apartments. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********66-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BG Personnel Services, L.P.

Defendants

CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company

211 E. 7Th Street, Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

B&M Management Company, LLC

9842 Wyncrest Circle

Montgomery, AL 36117

b/s Corporation Service Company d/b/a

211 E. 7Th Street, Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

d/b/a 7 Square Apartments

211 E. 7Th Street, Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

Silber Montgomery, LLC

211 E. 7Th Street, Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A. Bernstein

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Motion for Default Judgment Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#4: Re: Return of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Citation: Mail to Attorney; Silber Montgomery, LLC: Served: 02/21/2017; Returned: 02/24/2017; B&M Management Company, LLC: Served: 02/21/2017; Returned: 02/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119120: BG Personnel Services, L.P.: (279.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff BG Personnel Services, L.P.; Total Financial Assessment: 279.00; Total Payments and Credits: 279.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 279.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig A. Bernstein