Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/09/2017 at 20:19:16 (UTC).

BG Personnel Services, L.P. vs ROCO Management, LLC d/b/a Northgate Apartments,and Reserve at Mt. Moriah Apartments, ROCO-Northgate, LLC d/b/a Northgate Apartments, and ROCO-Mt. Moriah, LLC d/b/a Reserve at Mt. Moriah Apartments

Case Summary

On 12/15/2016 BG Personnel Services, L P filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROCO Management, LLC d/b/a Northgate Apartments,and Reserve at Mt Moriah Apartments, ROCO-Northgate, LLC d/b/a Northgate Apartments, and ROCO-Mt Moriah, LLC d/b/a Reserve at Mt Moriah Apartments. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********20-3

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BG Personnel Services, L.P.

Defendants

ROCO Management, LLC

33 Bloomfield Hills Pkwy., Ste. 135

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

ROCO-Mt. Moriah, LLC

33 Bloomfield Hills Pkwy., Ste. 135

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

d/b/a Northgate Apartments

33 Bloomfield Hills Pkwy., Ste. 135

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

d/b/a Reserve at Mt. Moriah Apartments

33 Bloomfield Hills Pkwy., Ste. 135

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

ROCO-Northgate, LLC

33 Bloomfield Hills Pkwy., Ste. 135

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

d/b/a Northgate Apartments,and Reserve at Mt. Moriah Apartments

33 Bloomfield Hills Pkwy., Ste. 135

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A. Bernstein

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2017
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Civil Docket Doc ID# 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Judgment - Default Doc ID# 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Motion for Default Judgment Doc ID# 12: Motion (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Certificate of Secretary of State Doc ID# 11: ROCO-Mt. Moriah LLC dba Reserve at Mt. Moriah Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Certificate of Secretary of State Doc ID# 10: ROCO-Northgate LLC dba Northgate Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Certificate of Secretary of State Doc ID# 9: ROCO Mgmt LLC dba Northgate Apartments and Reserve at Mt. Moriah Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Letter Doc ID# 8: Re: Certificate Of Secretary Of State

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 7: Return of Service; Original Ciation - ROCO-Mt. Moriah, LLC d/b/a Reserve at Mt. Moriah Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 6: Return of Service; Original Citation - ROCO-Northgate, LLC d/b/a Northgate Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 5: Return of Service; Original Citation - ROCO Management, LLC d/b/a Northgate Apartments, and Reserve at Mt. Moriah Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Letter Doc ID# 4: Re: Paper Returns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Citation: Citns for TX Sec. of State mld to attorney's Office.; ROCO Management, LLC: Served: 12/22/2016; Returned: 01/03/2017; ROCO-Northgate, LLC: Served: 12/22/2016; Returned: 01/03/2017; ROCO-Mt. Moriah, LLC: Served: 12/22/2016; Returned: 01/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-117469: BG Personnel Services, L.P.: (414.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff BG Personnel Services, L.P.; Total Financial Assessment: 414.00; Total Payments and Credits: 414.00; Balance Due as of 02/09/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 414.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roco Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig A. Bernstein