Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 04:53:23 (UTC).

BG Personnel Services, L.P. vs AWE Carybrook, LLC, d/b/a Avalon Townhomes and Artcraft Management, Inc. d/b/a Avalon Townhomes

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 BG Personnel Services, L P filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AWE Carybrook, LLC, d/b/a Avalon Townhomes and Artcraft Management, Inc d/b/a Avalon Townhomes. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********65-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BG Personnel Services, L.P.

Defendants

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue NW

Washington, DC 20037

Artcraft Management, Inc.

6722 Patterson Avenue Suite A

Richmond, VA 23226

AWE Carybrook, LLC

4Th Floor East

Washington, DC 20037

d/b/a Avalon Townhomes

4Th Floor East

Washington, DC 20037

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A. Bernstein

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2017
  • Certificate of Secretary of State Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#7: Re: certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#6: Artcraft MGMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Citation: Mail to Attorney; AWE Carybrook, LLC: Served: 02/21/2017; Returned: 02/24/2017; Artcraft Management, Inc.: Served: 02/21/2017; Returned: 02/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119119: BG Personnel Services, L.P.: (283.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff BG Personnel Services, L.P.; Total Financial Assessment: 283.00; Total Payments and Credits: 283.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 283.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig A. Bernstein