Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/08/2021 at 08:33:27 (UTC).

BG Personnel, L.P. vs The Toronto-Dominion Bank

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 BG Personnel, L P filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against The Toronto-Dominion Bank. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********31-3

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BG Personnel, L.P.

Defendants

The Toronto-Dominion Bank

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Or wherever it may be found

Austin, TX 78701

b/s its Registered Agent, CSC Corporation

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

d/b/a TD Bank

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A. Bernstein

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 8: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index # 6: without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 5: Correspondence re: Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: on writ of garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate: of Service - Notice to Judgment Debtors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170975: BG Personnel, L.P.: (280.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff BG Personnel, L.P.; Total Financial Assessment: 280.00; Total Payments and Credits: 280.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 280.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice: Mailed to attorney office 04/1/2021; Cypress Creek Apartments, LP: Unserved ; Rivergate KW Management, LLC: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Mailed to attorney office 04/1/2021; The Toronto-Dominion Bank: Served: 04/15/2021; Returned: 04/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2: Application for Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Toronto-Dominion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig A. Bernstein