This case was last updated from Tarrant County Court on 09/09/2023 at 22:00:37 (UTC).

Belva Lackey and Edwin Gail Lackey vs Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC dba Wal-Mart Store # 3631, and Wal-Mart

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 Belva Lackey and Edwin Gail Lackey filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC dba Wal-Mart Store 3631, and Wal-Mart. This case was filed in Tarrant County Court, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********36-1

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lackey, Belva

Lackey, Edwin Gail

Defendants

Wal-Mart

B/S Registered Agent, C.T. Corporation System

Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Haslam

Defendant Attorney

Derek S. Davis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2024
  • DocketWeek of Jury Trial Scheduling Only (Disregard Start Time): (7:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Pierson, Don)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketAgreed Scheduling Order Index # 40: (Amended) (Electronically Served to all Attorney's and/or Mailed to All Parties)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketVacation Letter Index # 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketAgreed Scheduling Order Index # 38: (Electronically Served to all Attorney's and/or Mailed to All Parties)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 37: Rule 203 Certification (Joshua Family Medicine Associates - Medical)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 36: Rule 203 Certification (McKenzie Family Medicine & MedSpa - Medical)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 35: Rule 203 Certification (Texas Health Harris Methodist Hospital Fort Worth - Medical)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 34: Rule 203 Certification (Dr Carlos Japas - Billing)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition Index # 33: Rule 203 Certification (Dr Carlos Japas - Medical)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Wal-Mart; Total Financial Assessment: 5.00; Total Payments and Credits: 5.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer & Special Exceptions Index # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-184383: Lackey, Belva: (308.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Lackey, Belva; Total Financial Assessment: 445.00; Total Payments and Credits: 445.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 445.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCitation: Served via Certified Mail 7/28/22; Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC: Served: 08/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less