This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/16/2017 at 18:57:39 (UTC).

BELMONT OAKS APTS vs. JOSIE SOTO AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 10/28/2015 BELMONT OAKS APTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOSIE SOTO AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4109

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELMONT OAKS APTS

2500 Nw 18Th #123

Fort Worth, TX 76106

Defendant

SOTO, JOSIE

Fort Worth, TX 76106

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2015
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $519.00; Awarded To: BELMONT OAKS APTS; Awarded Against: JOSIE SOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION: 121515 WRIT RETD/UNEXECUTED/CANCELLED BY PLTF; SOTO, JOSIE: Returned Unserved 12/16/2015; Returned: 12/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued to Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Writ of Possession Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • Bond for Appeal Set: AT $1,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is: $575

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • Default Notice Mailed: TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • Evict - Default Judgment for Possession, Past Due Rent, & CC: $519 PAST DUE RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • Hearing: (9:30 AM) () : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • EVICTION: 110215 CITN RETD/EXECUTED 102815/BY SERVING ADULT MALE/SET FOR TRAIL (111115 @ 9:30AM); SOTO, JOSIE: Served: 10/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Generate Label

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2015-02798: BELMONT OAKS APTS: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2015-02566: ANTHONY J BARBER: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff BELMONT OAKS APTS; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELMONT OAKS APTS is a litigant