Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/12/2021 at 16:31:59 (UTC).

Bell Fund V Lancaster, LLC aka Bell Lancaster vs. Deja Mcknight AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Bell Fund filed an Other lawsuit against Lancaster, LLC aka Bell Lancaster. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0282

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 5

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bell Fund V Lancaster, LLC aka Bell Lancaster

2711 N. Haskell Ave. Suite 2400

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant

Mcknight, Deja

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Rodriguez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCase Transferred to Another Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketTranscript of Judgment on Appeal Prepared: AND ALL DOCUMENTS TRANSFERRED TO CC@LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketStatement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketMailed Pltf Notice-Statement of Inability on Appeal Filed: EMAIL PLTF ATTY REGARDING STATEMENT OF INABILITY FILED BY DEFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEviction - Statement of Inability to Pay for Appeal Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment; Awarded To: Bell Fund V Lancaster, LLC aka Bell Lancaster; Awarded Against: Deja Mcknight

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketExhibit(s) Filed By Plaintiff: IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketBond for Appeal Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEvict-Judgment for Plaintiff for Possesssion Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketHearing: (9:30 AM) () : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP5-2021-01504: Bell Fund V Lancaster, LLC aka Bell Lancaster: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Bell Fund V Lancaster, LLC aka Bell Lancaster; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: 4/23/21: CITN RETD/EXECUTED 4-20-21/BY SERVIGN DEFT: TRIAL DATE 5-4-21 @ 9:30 AM; Mcknight, Deja: Served: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiff's Sworn Complaint for Forcible Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELL FUND V LANCASTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Rodriguez