Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/02/2021 at 04:04:04 (UTC).

Bel Fossil Limited Partnership aka Aspire Fossil Creek vs. Ivelis Valentin,Israel Valentin

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Bel Fossil Limited Partnership aka Aspire Fossil Creek filed an Other lawsuit against Ivelis Valentin,Israel Valentin. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3638

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bel Fossil Limited Partnership aka Aspire Fossil Creek

2711 N. Haskell Ave Suite 2400

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendants

Valentin, Israel

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Valentin, Ivelis

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Rodriguez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMailed: TO ALL PARTIES//MLN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF'S ATTY//MLN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: MLN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: E-Court Trial; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Other; EV ZOOM HEARING/ZOOM LINK: https://txcourts.zoom.us/j/91021197076 //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: Notice of Nonsuit/'EFILE/MLN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: EXECUTED//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: EXECUTED//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCITATION: 2 DEFNS/KAC; Valentin, Ivelis: Served: 04/19/2021; Returned: 04/20/2021; Valentin, Israel: Served: 04/19/2021; Returned: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMailed: TO PLTF/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEmailed: ZOOM HEARING NOTIFICATION TO PLTF Y/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: ATTACHED TO DEFN CIT/MLD AND EMAILED TO PLTF//KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-02188: Bel Fossil Limited Partnership aka Aspire Fossil Creek: (196.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Bel Fossil Limited Partnership aka Aspire Fossil Creek; Total Financial Assessment: 196.00; Total Payments and Credits: 196.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 196.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCourt Notes: CARES ACT AFF NOT FILED/KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED/ MIL AFF/MISSING STATUS PROOF/VC FOR EDP //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bel Fossil Limited Partnership aka Aspire Fossil Creek is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Rodriguez