This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/01/2023 at 04:32:04 (UTC).

Bcg Equities, Llc vs. Mikala Kobe

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 Bcg Equities, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mikala Kobe. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3662

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bcg Equities, Llc

Defendant

Kobe, Mikala

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: DWOP Hearing; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketEmailed: DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: DG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: EFILED/BY PLTF ATTY/WITH COVER LETTER AND PROPOSED ORDER/HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of DWOP Hearing: DUE TO NON-SERVICE SET FOR 3/17/2023 @ 1:00 PM EMAILED TO PLTF ATTY//MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return/EFILED/HG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2023-00740: Bcg Equities, Llc: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Bcg Equities, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL//MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: MichaelJAdamsTX@abclegal.com//MLN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less