This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/01/2021 at 19:30:42 (UTC).

Bank Of America, N.a. vs. Richard Rogers

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Bank Of America, N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Richard Rogers. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5780

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America, N.a.

275 W Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Rogers, Richard

Fort Worth, TX 76123-2536

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ana Elizabeth Novak

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/3 Months: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEmailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketEmailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Rogers, Richard: Served: 09/17/2021; Returned: 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-06291: Bank Of America, N.a.: (48.75)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Bank Of America, N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 48.75; Total Payments and Credits: 48.75; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 48.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ana E Novak