This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/07/2022 at 13:14:26 (UTC).

Bank Of America N.a. vs. Luis V. Recalde

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Bank Of America N a filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Luis. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8655

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America N.a.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Recalde, Luis V.

Roanoke, TX 76262

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due: (8:30 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DFNT, COURT INFORMED OF SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: ALTERNATE SERVICE ON 7/22/22 @ 8:35AM BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: SIGNED BY JUDGE. EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY ABC LEGAL VIA EFILE. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2022-02569: Bank Of America N.a.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Bank Of America N.a.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Recalde, Luis V.: Served: 07/22/2022; Returned: 07/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: TO PPS FOR SERVICE.AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper